Woods-Mullins v. Panhandle Community Services et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew J Kacsmaryk |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00231 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 07, 2023 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
Panhandle Community Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheree Woods-Mullins
200 S Tyler Street
Amarillo, TX 79101 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Amanda Hipplite
Terminated: 02/01/2023
|
|
Defendant
Sherry Lovett
Terminated: 02/01/2023
|
|
Defendant
Mya Rayes
Terminated: 02/01/2023
|
|
Defendant
Susie Ybarra
Terminated: 02/01/2023
|
|
Defendant
Magi York
Terminated: 02/01/2023
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 09/28 2:19 PM
ORDER of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins. Under 5TH CIR. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of September 25, 2023, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely file a brief and record excerpts. (daa) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Letter | ||
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 07/07 4:54 PM
ORDER granting29 Defendant's Motion to Substitute Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 7/7/2023) (daa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 07/07 4:57 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Fri Jul 7 16:57:23 CDT 2023 (crt) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 06/30 3:53 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Laura Pratt,Laura Pratt,Laura Pratt for Panhandle Community Services. Motion filed by Panhandle Community Services Attorney Laura Pratt added to party Panhandle Community Services(pty:dft) (Pratt, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Tue 06/20 2:52 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 23-10557 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (daa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/20 2:53 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:28. Tue Jun 20 14:53:53 CDT 2023 (crt) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/16 10:51 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 6/16/2023) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 06/16 10:52 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:27. Fri Jun 16 10:52:16 CDT 2023 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/13 3:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins (daa) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Transcript Order Form DKT-13 - Transcript Requested/Not Requested
Tue 06/13 3:33 PM
Transcript Order Form: re24 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested Reminder: If the transcript is ordered for an appeal, Appellant must also file a copy of the order form with the appeals court. (daa) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 06/01 10:31 AM
USCA Case Number 23-10557 in USCA5 for24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins. (daa) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 05/25 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement to the Fifth Circuit by Sheree Woods-Mullins. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (nht) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 05/25 4:09 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. (Copy of Transcript Order Form also mailed) Thu May 25 16:09:49 CDT 2023 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 05/09 4:28 PM
ORDER: On May 4, 2023, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Initial Discovery "Motion"). ECF No. 22. But the Court previously dismissed her claims against all Defendants. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED, and the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close the case. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 5/9/2023) (awc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 05/09 4:28 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:23. Tue May 9 16:28:57 CDT 2023 (crt) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Discovery
Thu 05/04 11:11 AM
MOTION for Initial Discovery filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins (nht) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
Mon 05/01 3:05 PM
ORDER granting17 MOTION to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 5/1/2023) (nht) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 05/01 3:05 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. Mon May 1 15:05:59 CDT 2023 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 03/28 11:27 AM
RESPONSE filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins re:17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement . (awc) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/17 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Sheree Woods-Mullins. New address: 200 S Tyler Street, Amarillo, TX 79101. (daa) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 03/15 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Vizcaino on behalf of Panhandle Community Services. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vizcaino, Christine) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim More Definite Statement
Wed 03/15 3:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement () filed by Panhandle Community Services Attorney Christine Vizcaino added to party Panhandle Community Services(pty:dft) (Vizcaino, Christine) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned
Thu 02/23 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Panhandle Community Services ; served on 2/22/2023. (nht) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/22 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Panhandle Community Services. (USM-285, Summons, ECF Nos. 3, 11, and 14 emailed to USMS for service.) (awc) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Wed 02/01 5:32 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE SERVICE ADDRESSES FOR DEFENDANT: Plaintiff must complete the form(s), provide addresses for the U.S. Marshal's Office to effect service on the defendants, and return the forms to the Clerk's Office within thirty (30) days, no later than March 3, 2023. Failure by plaintiff to meet this deadline may result in the dismissal of these claims without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/1/2023) (daa) |
|
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Wed 02/01 5:24 PM
RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT AS TO NON-ENTITY DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court determines there is no just reason to delay entry of final judgment as to the individual persons listed and named in Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. ECF No. 4 at 1. The undersigned United States District Judge issued an order DISMISSING from the above-named action the individual. Judgment is rendered accordingly. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/1/2023) (daa) |
|
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 02/01 5:18 PM
ORDER: The Court finds that (1) Plaintiff qualifies for informa pauperis status, (2) Plaintiff's claims against the individual non-entity defendants are barred, and (3) appointing counsel in her civil is not necessary. Thus, Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED, the individual non-entity defendants are DISMISSED, and Plaintiff's Motions for the Court to Appoint Counsel are DENIED. Motions terminated:8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel,10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Parties Mya Rayes, Susie Ybarra, Magi York, Amanda Hipplite and Sherry Lovett terminated. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/1/2023) (daa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/01 5:36 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12,13,14. Summons Form included in mailing. Wed Feb 1 17:36:36 CST 2023 (crt) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/20 10:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nht) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 01/06 2:07 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins. (awc) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 12/21 1:52 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins (nht) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 12/21 1:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins (nht) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 12/15 3:10 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint that complies with Rule 8. Plaintiff must file the amended complaint on or before January 20, 2022. Failure to comply with this Order or the requirements of Rule 8 may result in dismissal of this action. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 12/15/2022) (daa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 12/15 3:13 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Dec 15 15:13:01 CST 2022 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 12/13 11:13 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Dec 13 11:13:18 CST 2022 (crt) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/12 1:42 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 12/12/2022) (nht) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 12/09 11:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins (nht) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/09 11:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sheree Woods-Mullins. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (nht) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/09 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sheree Woods-Mullins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nht) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 12/09 11:06 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (nht) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Kacsmaryk
Fri 12/09 11:06 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nht) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 12/09 11:09 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of Complaint also mailed) Fri Dec 9 11:09:39 CST 2022 (crt) |