California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-mj-04531
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2022 11:21 PM PST
Defendant
Christopher Manuel Lora (1)
Represented By
Benjamin J. Cheeks
Law Offices Of Benjamin J. Cheeks, A.P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Edward Chang
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2022 11:49 PM PST
Friday, December 09, 2022
Arrest of Christopher Manuel Lora (no document attached) (cdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Christopher Manuel Lora.(cdw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Christopher Manuel Lora: Initial Appearance set for 12/12/2022 before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (cdw)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Edward Chang appearing for USA. (Chang, Edward)Attorney Edward Chang added to party USA(pty:pla) (maq).
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Christopher Manuel Lora (mjw)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Initial Appearance as to Christopher Manuel Lora held on 12/12/2022. Appointed Attorney Benjamin J. Cheeks(n/a) for Christopher Manuel Lora. Bond set as to Christopher Manuel Lora (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/22/22 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Arraignment set for 1/05/23 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. ) (CD# 12/12/2022 BGS 22-1:2:02-2:47). (Plaintiff Attorney Kelly Reis AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Carmen Rivera FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Christopher Manuel Lora (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Christopher Manuel Lora (1) $15,000 P/S secured by 1 financially responsible adult.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/12/2022. (vyc)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Christopher Manuel Lora: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/12/22. (aje)
Related: [-]