Sinder v. Monsanto Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-08893 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 3:22-cv-00338 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2023 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredric L Sinder
Executor of the Estate of Paulyne S. Holten-Sinder, Deceased 2511 Oakmoor Lane
Dayton, OH 45459 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
Terminated: 12/07/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Wed 11/08 8:54 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 11/6/2023 in the MDL 2741 master file (dkt. #17469), civil case no. 3:22-cv-08893-VC Sinder v. Monsanto Company et al is terminated. cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER Dismissing Cases with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Pretrial Order No. 240. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/6/2023. Associated Cases: see Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
![]() CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-366): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/14/2022; certified by the Clerk's Office from CAND on 12/14/2022. (er) |
|
7 | 7
![]() CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-366): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/14/2022. (er) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 12/14 12:06 PM
Case transferred to District of California Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 12/14 5:22 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Ohio, 3:22-cv-00338, Sinder v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-08893-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 366 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
NOTATION ORDER approving6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Claims Against Bayer Corporation filed by Fredric L Sinder. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 12/07/2022. (tp) | ||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |