Naderi v. ResMed Inc et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Damon R Leichty |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00459 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Dec 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Allen Superior Court 9, Allen County, Indiana, 02D09-2204-CT-000157 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:37 AM EDT |
Judge Holly A Brady
|
|
Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins
|
|
Defendant
Medical Service Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ResMed Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ResMed Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
MSC Sleep
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad H Naderi
6825 Ramblewood Drive, Apt H
Fort Wayne, IN 46835 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
105 | 105
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 09/03 2:31 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to90 Notice of Appeal and99 Notice of Appeal filed by Mohammad H Naderi. This cause, docketed on July 8, 2024, is DISMISSED for failure to timely pay the required docketing fee, pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b).(sej) |
|
Att: 1 Final Judgment (certified copy) |