Andrews et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04586 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:22-cv-10244 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 19, 2023 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Plaintiff
David Tibbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cornell Shelby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shanna Schofield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Randolph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Officer Gary Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Railsback
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Prohaska
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Peoples
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Lynn Manns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Kellner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerri Hagermanurick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Farley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Erbes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Arney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yves Brown Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Debra Fitzhugh-Davis, Terresse Barnes, Amy Bartels, Pearl Baulwin-Tillmon, Thomas Besaw, William Christopher Byrd, Lyle Chapman, Donald Dennett, Larry Ford, Jerome Givens, Lance Hansen, Michelle Hutcheson-Tipton, Jose Kader, Dave Kellner, Dallin Lee, Jennifer Miller, John Price, Calvin Robinson, Steven Ruiz, Angie Stephens, Cathleen White, Brandon Whittemore, Nancy Burke, Rexalyn Struensee, Stephanie Poole, George Pope, William Post, Dennis Reale, Patrick Farley, Jerri Hagermanurick, David Martin, Thomas Prohaska, Cornell Shelby, Gary Wilson, Christopher Colbert Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/28 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carl Brown, Jim Dmeleo, Eric Johnson, Daniel Lautaret, Peter Truxillo, John Andrews, Lee Crews, Larry Fletcher, Steven Kennedy, Ramon Montoya, Abel Moreno, Daniel Richards, Bruce Shinabarger, Robert Thomas, Dale Bourgeois, William Swapp Jr., Jose Tellez, Timothy Watts, Michael Womack, Patrick Allen, Mica Calfee, William Keefe, Taunis Nielsen, Carolyn Crisp, Gerard Cook, Randall Hale, John Kendall, George Weeks, Kenneth Crouch, Earl Hoal, Paul Hollis, Eric Houston, William Lademann, Gregg Noury, Michael Schaffer, Donald Crook, Ernie Huizar, James Paulk, Ramond Williams, Caulin Delaney, Kristen Delaney, Kristen Delaney, Sean Delaney, Edward Hanlon, Tracey Hanlon, Tracey Hanlon, Laura Pease, Leslie Pease, Matthew Pease, Meredith Pease, Meredith Pease Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Sallinger without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Sallinger, Gary, Turney, Robery, Barnes, Randi, Miller, William, Street, John, Murphy, Kevin, Gasper Jr, Rudulph, Lake, Ralph D, Marigny, Frank, Stewart, Junious, Young, Donald, Murry Jr., Louis, Beasley, Anne, Perez, Nydia, Cortez Jr, Pedro, Oatis, Danny, Walker, James A, Watson, Barry, Berfield, Dean, Coats, John, Ellsworth II, Richard, Smith, Jeffery, Cooper, Dale, Tibbs, David, Green, KennethAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/30 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lisa Railsback Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-04586-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 12/20/2022), 1:22-cv-10244, Andrews et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04586-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 12/20 1:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-10244. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Tue 12/20 9:54 AM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) |
||
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 12/20 1:38 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 12/20/2022), 1:22-cv-10244, Andrews et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04586-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/20 9:54 AM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/16/2022) (vba) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 3M Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; party text entered incorrectly. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | ||
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 159344/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27035677).Document filed by 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint |