Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-01742
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 31, 2022 12:38 AM MST
Defendant
Marco Moreno-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Maritza Heras
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Louis C Uhl
Us Attorneys Office - Yuma, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/31/2022 1:04 AM MST
Saturday, November 19, 2022
Arrest of Marco Moreno-Martinez on 11/19/2022. (NM) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Marco Moreno-Martinez. (NM) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(NM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Marco Moreno-Martinez held on 11/21/2022. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Maritza Heras for the defendant with Appointment Type: FPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to the defendant held on 11/21/2022. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing as to the defendant waived on 11/21/2022. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required for the defendant (1) Spanish. U.S Marshals are directed to obtain medical attention for the defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Louis Uhl (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Maritza Heras for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:53 PM to 2:59 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Marco Moreno-Martinez. I conclude that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. IT IS ORDERED that should an appeal of this detention order be filed with the District Court, it is counsel's responsibility to deliver a copy of the motion for review/reconsideration to Pretrial Services at least one day prior to the hearing set before the District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if a release to a third party is to be considered, it is counsel's responsibility to notify Pretrial Services sufficiently in advance of the hearing before the District Court to allow Pretrial Services an opportunity to interview and investigate the potential third party custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 11/21/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Marco Moreno-Martinez. (Heras, Maritza) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Marco Moreno-Martinez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 11/23/2022. (NM) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
8 8 MINUTE ORDER: Set/Reset Hearings as to Marco Moreno-Martinez. Change of Plea Hearing set for 12/29/2022 at 09:30 AM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 98 West 1st Street, Yuma, AZ 85364 before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NM) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
9 9 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Marco Moreno-Martinez. (MM)[2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT PENDING as to Marco Moreno-Martinez. Judge Susan M. Brnovich drawn. Waiver number 22-974. (JMA) [2:22-mj-02944-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
11 11 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Marco Moreno-Martinez. (MM)
Related: [-]
12 12 INFORMATION - Felony as to Marco Moreno-Martinez (1) count(s) 1. (MM)
Related: [-]
13 13 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Marco Moreno-Martinez for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (MM)
Related: [-]
14 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Change of Plea Hearing as to Marco Moreno-Martinez held on 12/29/2022. Marco Moreno-Martinez (1) enters a plea of guilty to the Information. The Court directs the US Probation Office to prepare a Presentence Report. Appearances : AUSA John Ballos (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Maritza Heras for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Sentencing set for 4/3/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Related [+] Hearing held 9:32 AM to 10:05 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MM)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
15 15 LODGED PLEA AGREEMENT as to Marco Moreno-Martinez re: 14 Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only). (MM)
Related: [-]
16 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION UPON A PLEA OF GUILTY as to Marco Moreno-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 12/29/2022.(MM)
Related: [-]