Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-43840

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:23-ap-04002
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
St. Louis Bank
14323 S Outer Forty Rd
Town and Country, MO 63017
Represented By
St. Louis Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Veripac, LLC
4765 Earth City Expressway
Bridgeton, MO 63034
Represented By
Robert E. Eggmann
Carmody Macdonald P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Smartpac, Inc.
4750 Earth City Expressway
Bridgeton, MO 63044
Represented By
David M. Dare
Herren, Dare & Streett
contact info
Robert E. Eggmann
Carmody Macdonald P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, August 11, 2023
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/11 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/11/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - AP Wed 08/09 1:47 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+]. (Egg, M)
Related: [-] 34 Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.
34 34 notice Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/09 11:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 08/09 1:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:23-ap-4002: Dismissed. (Egg, M)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/09 1:49 PM
Adversary Case 4:23-ap-4002 Closed (Egg, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
court Hearing Held Tue 06/06 7:13 AM
Hearing Not Held Related [+] - Complaint to be dismissed. (how, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 05/10 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 05/10/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31
Monday, May 08, 2023
32 32 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/08 9:09 AM
Amended Order of Court Relating to Trial Related [+]. Discovery due by 5/23/2023. Trial date set for 6/6/2023 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.i, k
31 31 order Generic Order Mon 05/08 9:07 AM
Order Granting Motion (30 Second Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.) Related [+]
Related: [-] i, k
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
30 30 motion Generic Motion Wed 05/03 4:39 PM
Second Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, and Smartpac, Inc. (Eggmann, Robert) Modified on 5/4/2023 (Egg, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/23 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/23/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
28 28 misc Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/23 2:35 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
27 27 court Resend Document Tue 03/21 4:38 PM
Resend Document Related [+] (ahl, s)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
Saturday, March 18, 2023
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/18 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/18/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Thursday, March 16, 2023
25 25 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/16 12:00 PM
Amended Order of Court Relating to Trial Related [+]. Discovery due by 4/25/2023. Trial date set for 5/9/2023 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.i, k
24 24 order Generic Order Thu 03/16 11:58 AM
Order Granting Motion (23 Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC) Related [+]
Related: [-] i, k
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
23 23 motion Generic Motion Tue 03/14 11:27 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/09 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/09/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
21 21 court Resend Document Tue 03/07 3:12 PM
Resend Document Related [+] (pot, t)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.,12 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.
Sunday, February 19, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/19 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 02/19/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, February 17, 2023
19 19 order Expedite Hearing Fri 02/17 1:28 PM
Order Granting Motion For Preliminary Injunction Related [+], Granting Motion Expedite Hearing (pot, t)
Related: [-] 11 12
Thursday, February 16, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/16 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 02/16/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
17 17 order Extend Time Tue 02/14 8:45 AM
Agreed Order Extending Deadline by Which to file Responsive Pleading to 3/1/23. (Egg, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
16 16 answer Objection Wed 01/18 7:24 AM
Objection Filed by Defendant St. Louis Bank Related [+]. (Beck, Steven)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC
court Hearing Held Wed 01/18 1:11 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Granted per the announcements at the hearing - submit order. (how, j)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.,12 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.
Friday, January 13, 2023
15 15 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 01/13 5:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas H Riske Filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC. (Riske, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/13 5:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC Related [+]. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ,12 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) ,13 Notice of Hearing
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/13 5:22 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/18/2023 at 11:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for12 , (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC Hearing scheduled 1/18/2023 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.
12 12 motion Expediting Hearing Fri 01/13 5:21 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC Hearing scheduled 1/18/2023 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
11 11 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/13 5:20 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Plaintiffs Smartpac, Inc., Veripac, LLC (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
10 10 court Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders by BK Court - Executed Tue 01/10 10:31 AM
Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders by Bankruptcy Court Executed by Smartpac, Inc. and Veripac, LLC on: 1/10/2023 (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/10 10:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on St. Louis Bank 1/10/2023 (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
8 8 court Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued Mon 01/09 1:59 PM
Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued on St. Louis Bank Date Issued 1/9/2023, Answer Due 2/8/2023 Trial date set for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/09 1:55 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 3/14/2023. Trial date set for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Veripac, LLC, Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc.
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
6 6 misc Support/Supplement Wed 01/04 2:59 PM
Support/Supplement Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Plaintiff Smartpac, Inc. Related [+]. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 01/04 12:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David A. Sosne Filed by Interested Parties Network Packaging Group, LLC, Nexgen Packaging Group LLC, Sheri Edwards, Carey Edwards, Clayton Cameron. (Sosne, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 01/04 12:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Interested Party Stephen D. Coffin . (Egg, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Generic) Wed 01/04 10:04 AM
Notice and Entry of Appearance and Request for Notices Certificate of Service: Filed. Filed by Interested Party Stephen D. Coffin. (Coffin, Stephen) NOTE: THE COURT HAS RE-DOCKETED THIS PLEADING AS A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE, SEE DOCKET ENTRY4 . Modified on 1/4/2023 (Egg, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
2 2 crditcrd Internet Credit Card Receipt Tue 01/03 3:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-04002 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A19113805, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/03 3:38 PM
Adversary case 23-04002 Complaint by Veripac, LLC, Smartpac, Inc. (attorney David M. Dare, Robert E. Eggmann ) against St. Louis Bank Fee Amount $350. (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(71 (Injunctive relief - imposition of stay))(Eggmann, Robert) Modified on 1/4/2023 (Egg, M)
Related: [-]