Barry et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00023 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:22-cv-01560 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2023 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Aubrey Ray Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Frederick Callahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Campbell
131941 Lieber Correctional Institution PO Box 205
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rudolph Joseph Caparrotta, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Javier Augustine Carrasco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Michael Bateman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Davis Carson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramon Cecena, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Barry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Lowell Barr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Barker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Franklin Barfield, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ollie Darnie Barbary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robbie Gerard Baiiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Eugene Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony George Antanaitis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Rae Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry James Allore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dominic Joseph Albanese, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roland Jesus Alaniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andy Wayne Akers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse David Abbott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert Benitez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harlan G Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Frank Benton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Bertoncin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Erin Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Blackmon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshall Edward Blore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devin Glenn Boler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Charles Bone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Bosquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Bendict Brambila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Roy Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy D Benedetto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Paul Brown, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Walker Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sidney Newton Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Robert Bauder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Thomas Buffington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Joseph Buras
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jarrod Ray Burt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Paul Busch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Carlisle Butcher, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerry Wayne Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Joseph Byrne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Richard Byrnes
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Robert Berger
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 2:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Robert Berger. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00023-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern, 2:22-cv-01560, Barry et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00023-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/05 1:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:22-cv-01560. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
Friday, December 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond by 3M Company. filed by 3M Company (Harmon, Benjamin) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4230733 (ALND receipt# B-2781). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2022-903464.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 12/20/2022 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2022-903464.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2 |