Payne et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00024 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:22-cv-01559 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2023 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Dean Vest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Robert Westphal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Marshall Strock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Eugene Reeser, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Bagley Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brady Joseph Wolfe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Lynn Payne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Passarelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Attilio Panaccione
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Michael Niosi, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Scott Ney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Albert McGuire
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wallace George Lovely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregg Laurence Leleniewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Leeland Lambiase
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Conway Horn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Jeffery Heineck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Duane Harbaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Andrew Gunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Randolph Gregory
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Kevin Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Brent Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John William Carey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Anthony Bouterie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Anthony Bielenberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern, 2:22-cv-01559, Payne et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00024-RMG (sshe, ) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/05 1:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:22-cv-01559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/3/2023. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
Friday, December 23, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond by 3M Company. filed by 3M Company (Harmon, Benjamin) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company1 from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2022-903412.00, filed by 3M Company. | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2, (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] (Entered: 12/15/2022 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4230737 (ALND receipt# B-2782). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company1 from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2022-903412.00, filed by 3M Company.(CTF). (Radney, W) Modified on 12/20/2022 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/5/2023.] |