Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-20583
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 07, 2023 2:40 AM EST
Defendant
Daniel Castellon Ruacho (2)
Represented By
John William Wylie, IV
John W. Wylie, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Raul Castellon Ruacho (1)
Represented By
Aimee Allegra Ferrer
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Defendant
Raul Alberto Chan-Chel (3)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julie M. Maloney
U.S. Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Marx Calderon
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/07/2023 3:03 AM EST
Sunday, November 20, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Raul Castellon Ruacho (1), Daniel Castellon Ruacho (2). (br) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (br) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
3 3 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Raul Castellon Ruacho (Kay, Ashley) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Raul Castellon Ruacho held on 11/21/2022. Bond recommendation/set: Raul Castellon Ruacho (1) Temporary Pretrial Detention at Government request based on risk of flight and danger to the community. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 11/18/2022. Arraignment set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for Raul Castellon Ruacho (Digital 13:56:44) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/21/2022. (fbn) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Daniel Castellon Ruacho held on 11/21/2022. Bond recommendation/set: Daniel Castellon Ruacho (2) Temporary Pretrial Detention at Government request based on risk of flight and danger to the community. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 11/18/2022. Arraignment set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Pretrial Detention Hearing set for 11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: John William Wylie, IV for Daniel Castellon Ruacho for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 11/21/2022. (Digital 13:59:22) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/21/2022. (fbn) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
Set/Reset Hearings as to Raul Castellon Ruacho, Daniel Castellon Ruacho: ( Arraignment set for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.), Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Raul Castellon Ruacho, Daniel Castellon Ruacho re: Pretrial Detention hearing. (fbn) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Status Conference Re: Pretrial Detention as to Raul Castellon Ruacho held on 11/23/2022., ( Arraignment set for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.), Bond Recommendation/Set/Reset as to Raul Castellon Ruacho (1) STIPULATED $100,000 personal surety bond. Defendant RELEASED. (Digital 10:18:18) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/23/2022. (fbn) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Status Conference Re: Pretrial Detention as to Daniel Castellon Ruacho held on 11/23/2022., ( Arraignment set for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.), Bond Recommendation/Set/Reset as to Daniel Castellon Ruacho (2) STIPULATED $100,000 personal surety bond. Defendant RELEASED. (Digital 10:18:18) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/23/2022. (fbn) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
8 8 $100,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Raul Castellon Ruacho Approved by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (fbn) (fbn). [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/29/2022) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
9 9 $100,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Daniel Castellon Ruacho Approved by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (fbn) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/29/2022) (fbn). (fbn). [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/29/2022) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
10 10 NOTICE of Reassignment of Assistant US Attorney. Julie M. Maloney appearing for USA. Marc Chattah terminated. Attorney Julie M. Maloney added to party USA(pty:pla). (Maloney, Julie) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
11 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Raul Castellon Ruacho, Daniel Castellon Ruacho. (mdc) [1:22-mj-03979-EGT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
12 12 INDICTMENT and FORFEITURE as to Raul Castellon Ruacho (1) count(s) 1, 2, Daniel Castellon Ruacho (2) count(s) 1, 2, Raul Alberto Chan-Chel (3) count(s) 1. (mdc) (mdc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/9/2022) Restricted Unredacted Indictment