Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00334
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2022
Terminated:Dec 09, 2022
Defendant
Donald Ryan Mullenix
Plaintiff
USA

GPO May 30 2023
ORDER re 39 Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Donald Ryan Mullenix. The Government's motion for a detention hearing is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/30/2023. (fcd)
GPO Feb 20 2024
JUDGMENT as to Donald Ryan Mullenix. Counts 1-2: 16 MONTHS imprisonment on each count to run concurrently; two (2) years supervised release on each count to run concurrently; $200 special penalty assessment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/20/2024. (fcd)
GPO Mar 15 2024
ORDER denying 87 Motion to Vacate (2255) and denying 88 Motion to Reconsider, Reduce, and/or Otherwise Modify Sentence as to Donald Ryan Mullenix. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/15/2024. Civil case 4:24-cv-00210-JM closed. (fcd)
GPO Apr 04 2024
ORDER denying 92 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Motion for Certificate of Appealability as to Donald Ryan Mullenix. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/4/2024. (fcd)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.