Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Paul C Huck
Case #: 1:23-cv-20084
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2023 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Cohen Dania Beach Hotel, LLC
Plaintiff
Windy Lucius
Represented By
Juan Courtney Cunningham
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, January 30, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Mon 01/30 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 01/12 4:42 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Cohen Dania Beach Hotel, LLC served on 1/11/2023, response/answer due 2/1/2023. (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order of Requirements Thu 01/12 2:06 PM
ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS IN AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT CASES. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to COHEN DANIA BEACH HOTEL LLC. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/09 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT against COHEN DANIA BEACH HOTEL LLC.,. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16226141, filed by WINDY LUCIUS.(Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 01/10 8:54 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
Related: [-]