Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-15939

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:23-ap-00012
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph Ferko
PO Box 239
Pasadena, MD 21123
Represented By
Joseph Ferko
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Ferko
412 Park Creek Road
Pasadena, MD 21122
Represented By
Daniel Alan Staeven
Frost & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, January 08, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/08 3:02 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-12 Closed. (Taylor, Kieshonda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sat 10/28 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
14 14 order Default Judgment Wed 10/25 11:29 AM
Order Granting Default Judgment - FOR THE REASONS STATED WITH PARTICULARITY ON THERECORD AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING HELD ON OCTOBER 18, 2023. Related [+]. (Taylor, Kieshonda)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ferko
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
13 13 court Hearing Held Thu 10/19 9:14 AM
Evidentiary Hearing Held Related [+].. P. 10 GRANTED FOR THE REASONS STATED WITH PARTICULARITY ON THE RECORD IN A TWO-PART ORAL RULING DELIVERED BY THE COURT. ORDER TO BE PREPARED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. (Yalley, Joyce)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ferko
Att: 1 PLAINTIFF EXHIBITS LIST
Att: 2 DEBTOR EXHIBIT LIST
Thursday, August 31, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing (Auto-Docket) Fri 09/01 7:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
11 11 court Notice of Hearing Tue 08/29 1:15 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 02:00 PM, U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT, COURTROOM 2-A, 101 WEST LOMBARD STREET, BALTIMORE, MD 21201. (Yalley, Joyce)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ferko
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 07/18 1:43 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Patricia Ferko. (Staeven, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 15, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Fri 06/16 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Joseph Ferko
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 06/13 12:55 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Joseph Ferko Related [+]. (Taylor, Kieshonda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ferko
Monday, June 12, 2023
7 7 apmisc Request Mon 06/12 3:02 PM
Request for Default on behalf of Patricia Ferko Filed by Daniel Alan Staeven. (Staeven, Daniel) Modified on 6/13/2023 (Taylor, Kieshonda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
6 6 court Court Instruction Thu 04/06 2:57 PM
Court Instruction - DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAY ONLY BE SOUGHT AFTER ENTRY OF DEFAULT. NO DEFAULT HAS BEEN ENTERED. THE COURT WILL CONSIDER THIS MOTION IF, AND WHEN, A DEFAULT IS ENTERED. Related [+]. (Taylor, Kieshonda)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ferko
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
5 5 motion Default Judgment Wed 04/05 12:00 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Patricia Ferko. (Staeven, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, February 06, 2023
4 4 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Mon 02/06 9:08 AM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Joseph Ferko 2/3/2023. (Staeven, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Thu 02/02 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, January 30, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 01/30 11:01 AM
Summons Issued on Joseph Ferko Date Issued 1/30/2023, Answer Due 3/1/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/5/2023 at 02:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Taylor, Kieshonda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ferko
Friday, January 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Fri 01/13 10:01 AM
Adversary case 23-00012 (61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)) Complaint by Daniel Alan Staeven on behalf of Patricia Ferko against Joseph Ferko. Fee Amount $350. (Staeven, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit