Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-30015
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jan 19, 2023 2:39 AM EST
Defendant
Ahmad Hawkins (1)
Represented By
Rhonda R. Brazile
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Eaton Brown
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/19/2023 2:45 AM EST
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Ahmad Hawkins held on 1/17/2023. Defendant requests an Identity Hearing. Detention Hearing set for 1/18/2023 01:00 PM Identity Hearing set for 1/18/2023 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Young) (AUSA: Eaton Brown) (EBut)
Related: [-]
1 1 PETITION for Transfer under Rule 5(c)(3) by United States of America as to Ahmad Hawkins (1). (NAhm)
Related: [-]
2 2 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Ahmad Hawkins held on 1/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.3 MB) (NAhm)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Ahmad Hawkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Ahmad Hawkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Ahmad Hawkins Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]