New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:23-cv-00428
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2023
Terminated:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2023 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Credit Suisse
Represented By
Lauren Ann Malanga
Epstein Becker & Green
contact info
Christopher John Yee Coyne
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Myra L. Brevard
2100 Bronx Park East Apt. 1B
Bronx, NY 10462


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Mon 03/17 1:03 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:55 USCA Mandate.(km)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
55 55 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 03/17 1:03 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to53 Notice of Appeal filed by Myra L. Brevard USCA Case Number 24-2421 Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e).Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 3/14/2025.(km)
Related: [-]