Haywood v. State of Kansas, et al
Original Case: 2:21-cv-02329
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-03009 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 08, 2023 1:28 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINE M. CANDIO, St. Luke's Hospital Orthopedic Service, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TODD A. SHAMASH, CEO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RAKESH PONNA PUREDDY, Dr.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MOHOMMED TAHBOUB, M.D.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID DUETHMAN, M.D.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
COURTNEY M. SCHELLPEPER, M.D.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT A. WINGERTER, Ph.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HERBERT BERNARD TANOWITZ, Dr.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MEYERKORD & RUSSELLA HERGOTT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER AVILA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JASON D. BRUNS, DR., D.O.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ADAM K. BRUNFIELDT, M.D.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT BURNS, Judge, Division #1
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCIO HEALTH ANALYTICS SOCRATES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAPITAL BLUE CROSS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DICKSON-DIVELEY MIDWEST ORTHOPAEDIC CLINIC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TAMMY EDDINGS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
BROWN & JAMES, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PAMELA WINTER
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
HAASH WILKERSON INSURANCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL STEPHENSEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
POST ACUTE MEDICAL, LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
TROY JHONSON, Human Relations
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALLISON L. GREENFIELD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KNIGHT, NICASTRO & MACKAY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM P. MAHONEY, Judge, Division #7
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
MAGELLAN HEALTH CARE, INC.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARDA ZIMMERMAN, Cedar Fair Management Company
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS HINRICHS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF KANSAS
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LATANYA HAYWOOD
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 06 2023
[10981135] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action by Clerk of Court. [23-3009] |
Docket last updated: 03/08/2023 1:28 AM MST |
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
[10970114] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/18/2023 Notice of appearance due on 02/01/2023 for Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Christopher Avila, Christine M. Candio, Allison L. Greenfield, Haash Wilkerson Insurance, Nicholas Hinrichs, Knight, Nicastro & MacKay, Meyerkord & Russella Hergott, LLC, Todd A. Shamash, St. Luke's Hospital, Michael Stephensen and Scott A. Wingerter, and Notice of appearance due on 02/17/2023 for LaTanya Haywood. Disclosure statement due on 02/01/2023 for Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Brown & James, P.C., Meyerkord & Russella Hergott, LLC and St. Luke's Hospital. Fee or ifp forms due 02/17/2023 for LaTanya Haywood. 23-3009 | ||
Att: 1 35 pgs Prelim ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |