Knellinger, et al v. Young, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01379
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01018 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 20, 2023 1:22 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID YOUNG, in his individual and official capacities as Colorado State Treasurer, Colorado Office of Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BIANCA GARDELLI, in her individual and official capacities as Director of Colorado Department of Treasury, Unclaimed Property Division,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID KNELLINGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT STOREY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/20/2023 1:22 AM MST |
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
[10970199] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/18/2023 Docketing statement due 02/01/2023 for David Knellinger and Robert Storey. Transcript order form due 02/01/2023 for David Knellinger and Robert Storey. Notice of appearance due on 02/01/2023 for Bianca Gardelli, David Knellinger, Robert Storey and David Young 23-1018 | ||
Att: 1 22 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |