Jane Doe v. Allegheny County Housing Authority, et al
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01105 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2024 3:46 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
ALLEGHENY COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FRANK AGGAZIO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Y. BEVERLY MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JIM BULLS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHAYLA CARTER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RONDA WYNO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN BELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JANE DOE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 3:46 AM EST |
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jane Doe in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01811. (KR) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs District Court Order 011223 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
2 pgs ORDER (Clerk) the district-court filings and that court’s docket for this case are currently under seal. That does not mean the documents filed in this Court will be sealed. The appellant’s notice of appeal and the associated district-court decisions have been docketed in this Court under seal. They will remain under seal for thirty days from this order to give the appellant an opportunity to file a motion asking this Court to seal them. If such a motion is filed, they will remain sealed until further order of this Court. Otherwise, they will be unsealed by the Clerk without further notice. (KR) |