W R Berkley Corp v. Julie Ann Dunai
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01223
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01079 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 8:54 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
JULIE ANN W. DUNAI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
W R BERKLEY CORP, a Delaware corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/27/2024 8:54 AM EST |
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Julie Ann W. Dunai in District Court No. 1-19-cv-01223. (SB) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs District Court Memorandum | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs District Court Judgment | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 7 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs CLERK ORDER The actions at Nos. 22-2963 and 23-1079 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The parties are advised that all subsequent case-opening forms, motions, and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Court’s electronic case filing (ECF) system. The briefing schedule that was previously issued in No. 22-2963 is VACATED. A consolidated briefing schedule governing both cases will be issued at the appropriate time after they are both ready to proceed to briefing. 22-2963 23-1079 (SB) |