Johnson v. Waffle House
Original Case: 3:21-cv-01940
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cr-10061 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 14, 2023 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Waffle House, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nelson Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/14/2023 3:30 AM CDT |
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Nelson Johnson 23-10061 (MBC) |