Crabtree v. Thibodeoux
Original Case: 6:22-cv-00437
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cr-40030 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 14, 2023 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Chief Appraiser Amanda Thibodeoux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lloyd H. Crabtree
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/14/2023 3:28 AM CDT |
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Lloyd H. Crabtree 23-40030 (NFD) |