Stenson v. Edmonds, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-01968
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01020 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 3:50 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
KEITH EDMONDS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CARGILL MEAT LOGISTICS SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SEAN STENSON
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 15 2023
[11044805] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Holmes, McHugh and Carson (authoring). Mandate to issue. [22-1285, 23-1020] |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2023 3:50 AM MST |
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
[10970680] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/20/2023 Docketing statement due 02/03/2023 for Sean Stenson. Transcript order form due 02/03/2023 for Sean Stenson. Notice of appearance due on 02/03/2023 for Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc., Keith Edmonds and Sean Stenson. Disclosure statement due on 02/03/2023 for Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc. 23-1020 | ||
Att: 1 55 pgs Transmittal letter and preliminary record | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |