Espinosa et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00322 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Colorado, 1:22-cv-03256 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2023 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company (I)
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
and as, in interest to 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation (I)
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc. (I)
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc. (I)
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (I)
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
National Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
and as, in interest to One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP (I)
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
as successor, in interest to 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation(I)
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The (I)
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC, The (I)
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Rosa L. Vigil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy M. Taormina-Weiss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rexalyn Struensee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom D. Strickland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn M. Nonan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JD McCowen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna L. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvador Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen L. Espinosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert S. Downen, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Debra Fitzhugh-Davis, Terresse Barnes, Amy Bartels, Pearl Baulwin-Tillmon, Thomas Besaw, William Christopher Byrd, Lyle Chapman, Donald Dennett, Larry Ford, Jerome Givens, Lance Hansen, Michelle Hutcheson-Tipton, Jose Kader, Dave Kellner, Dallin Lee, Jennifer Miller, John Price, Calvin Robinson, Steven Ruiz, Angie Stephens, Cathleen White, Brandon Whittemore, Nancy Burke, Rexalyn Struensee, Stephanie Poole, George Pope, William Post, Dennis Reale, Patrick Farley, Jerri Hagermanurick, David Martin, Thomas Prohaska, Cornell Shelby, Gary Wilson, Christopher Colbert Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Pdschun without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Podschun, Benjamin; Serkin, Warren; Gonzales, Salvador P.; McCowen, JD; Charles, Roberta; Robertson, James; Craddock, Kerry; Gesse, Michael; Gibbs, Gary; Kerfoot, Jimmy; Ramirez, Roger H; Wilkerson, Danny; Gibson, Kenneth; Alonzo, Miguel; Howard, Amy; Martinez, Anthony; Turner, Jessica; Barnes, Timothy W.; Burton, Roger R; Callender, Anthony R; Conti, Carolyn; Dunn, Douglas; Fuller, Luz; Gillenwater, Mark; Hanes, KathyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 1/24/2023), 1:22-cv-03256, Espinosa et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00322-RMG (sshe, ) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/24 11:14 AM
Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:22-cv-03256. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 01/24 11:21 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 1/24/2023), 1:22-cv-03256, Espinosa et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00322-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-116 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from District of Colorado, 22-cv-03256-MDB, to District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL No. 2873, by Clerk on 1/23/2023. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/24/2023.] | |
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 2/28/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/28/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/20/2022. (evaug) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/24/2023.] | |
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (norlin, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/24/2023.] | |
2 | 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/24/2023.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS INC, CHEMGUARD INC., THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., AMEREX Corporation, ARCHROMA U.S. Inc., ARKEMA Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, CHEMICALS, INC, CLARIANT CORPORATION, CORTEVA, INC., DEEPWATER CHEMICALS, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC., DYNAX CORPORATION, E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, John Doe Defendants 1-20, KIDDE-FENWAL, INC., NATION FORD CHEMICAL COMPANY, NATIONAL FOAM, INC, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, LP (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8839636)Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nancy Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert S Downen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Allen L. Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Salvador Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna L Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party JD McCowen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn M Nonan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tom D. Strickland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rexalyn Struensee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wendy M. Taormina-Weiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosa L. Vigil(pty:pla), filed by Robert S Downen, Rexalyn Struensee, Allen L. Espinosa, JD McCowen, Donna L Jones, Tom D. Strickland, Rosa L. Vigil, Salvador Gonzalez, Nancy Burke, Wendy M. Taormina-Weiss, Dawn M Nonan.(McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/24/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons, | ||
Att: 19 Summons, | ||
Att: 20 Summons, | ||
Att: 21 Summons, | ||
Att: 22 Summons |