Old Republic Insurance Company v. Burinskas et al
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey U Beaverstock |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2023 3:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Matthew J. Burinskas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jimmy Davidson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Rodgers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Republic Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/01 4:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re:77 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Republic Insurance Company. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 02/01/2024. (cjr) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
77 | 77
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/31 3:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Republic Insurance Company. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 01/31 3:39 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:77 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp) |