Elmen Holdings v. Martin Marietta
Original Case: 4:19-cv-03293
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-pcd-20023 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 3:13 PM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
Martin Marietta Materials, Incorporated, Successor by Merger to Texas Industries, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Elmen Holdings, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 15 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-20023 Affirmed] Judge: PEH, Judge: JES, Judge: JWE. Mandate issue date is 12/07/2023 [23-20023] |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2023 3:13 PM CST |
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Martin Marietta Materials, Incorporated 23-20023 (CCR) |