Patricia Lee v. Alan Chan
Original Case: 2:22-cv-07266
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01133 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 27, 2023 4:22 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ALAN CHAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATRICIA J. LEE, on behalf of her minor children, M.C. and B.C.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 26 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: HARDIMAN, PORTER and FREEMAN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 3. We grant Appellantā??s motion to file her reply brief out of time. |
Docket last updated: 07/27/2023 4:22 AM EDT |
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Patricia J. Lee in District Court No. 2-22-cv-07266. (AMR) | ||
Att: 1 9 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Opinion 010523 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order 010523 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |