Parks v. AIG
Original Case: 4:22-cv-00991
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cr-40044 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 26, 2023 2:20 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
AIG, an insurance company based in New York
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Timothy Henderson, a removed Oklahoma Judge accused of crimes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
David Prater, Oklahoma County District Attorney in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mike Hunter, Resigned Oklahoma State Attorney General, individually and officially
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Melissa Abernathy, Sheriff Deputy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brett Slimp, Sheriff Deputy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chicago Title, a California Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Oklahoma County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Tonya Parks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bennie Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Francis Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nyanza Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alexander Bednar
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 08 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-40044 Dismissed ] Judge: JEG , Judge: SAH , Judge: JCH. Mandate issue date is 11/30/2023 [23-40044] |
Docket last updated: 01/26/2023 2:20 AM CST |
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Alexander Bednar, Mr. Nyanza Cook, Mr. Bennie Gibson, Mr. Francis Gibson and Ms. Tonya Parks 23-40044 (ABT) |