Pizza Hut v. Pandya
Original Case: 5:21-cv-00089
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-pcd-40047 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 22, 2023 3:47 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
Jignesh N. Pandya
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Ronak Foods, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Pandya Restaurants L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JNP Foods, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
8 New Britain Pizza L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
Ronak Capital, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Pizza Hut L.L.C., as successor-in-interest to Pizza Hut, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/22/2023 3:47 AM CST |
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants 8 New Britain Pizza L.L.C., JNP Foods, L.L.C., Mr. Jignesh N. Pandya, Pandya Restaurants L.L.C., Ronak Capital, L.L.C. and Ronak Foods, L.L.C. 23-40047 (RLL) |