McGlothlen v. Commissioner, SSA
Original Case: 1:19-cv-00538
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01023 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 1:27 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER, SSA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BARBARA L. MCGLOTHEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BARBARA L. MCGLOTHLEN
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 22 2023
[10978682] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Matheson, Phillips and Rossman. [23-1023] |
Docket last updated: 02/25/2023 1:27 AM MST |
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
[10971436] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/23/2023. Fee or ifp forms due 02/23/2023 for Barbara L. McGlothen. Notice of appearance due on 02/07/2023 for Commissioner of Social Security, and Notice of appearance due on 02/23/2023 for Barbara L. McGlothen. 23-1023 | ||
Att: 1 75 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se | ||
[10971440] Appellant's brief received from Barbara L. McGlothen but not filed. Served on 01/24/2023. Manner of Service: email. 23-1023 | ||
Att: 1 59 pgs Brief | ||
Att: 2 118 pgs Appendix | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Envelope | ||
[10971698] Jurisdiction challenged. Proceedings are suspended pending further order of the court. Appellant's memorandum brief due 02/14/2023 for Barbara L. McGlothen. See order for details. 23-1023 |