Carla Slater v. Janet Yellen, et al
Original Case: 2:21-cv-02763
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01140 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2023 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
STEPHANIE SPROSS, FRONTLINE MANAGER TEAM 426, EXAM OPERATIONS, IRS
|
|
Defendant
LISA CHAN, OPERATION MANAGER, EXAM OPERATIONS, IRS
|
|
Defendant
CHARLOTTE A. BURROWS, CHAIR EEOC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JANET LOUISE YELLEN, SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JANET L. YELLEN, SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARLA SLATER
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 04 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: KRAUSE, PHIPPS and SCIRICA, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 8. Appellant's motion to supplement the appendix is granted. [23-1091, 23-1140] |
Docket last updated: 10/15/2023 6:17 AM EDT |
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Carla Slater in District Court No. 2-21-cv-02763. (JK) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |