Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:23-cv-80147
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2023
Re-opened:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 28, 2023 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Northstar Construction Management Company, Inc.
Represented By
Nicole F. Nachtsheim
Cole, Scott , Kissane, P.A.
contact info
David Andrew Kirsch
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Kyle Thomas Pliler
Represented By
Nicole F. Nachtsheim
Cole, Scott , Kissane, P.A.
contact info
David Andrew Kirsch
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Rodney Romano
Matrix Mediation 1655 Palm Avenue Suite 700
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Plaintiff
Sarah Ann Stratemeyer
Represented By
Kristian A Bie
contact info
Philip Dixon Parrish
Philip D Parrish PA
contact info
Jodi Chase Page
Labovick Law Group
contact info

GPO Jan 30 2024
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE, denying without prejudice 26 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
GPO Apr 01 2024
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL, denying 35 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) Modified on 4/1/2024 to reflect document as an Opinion (bb).
GPO Apr 16 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE, granting 32 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
76 76 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 04/26 12:14 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
75 75 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 04/25 4:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Northstar Construction Management Company, Inc., Kyle Thomas Pliler (Kirsch, David)
Related: [-]
74 74 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/25 11:37 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court has been notified that the parties have reached a settlement agreement. However, the case will remain open, all pre-trial deadlines will remain active, and the trial date will remain set until such time as the parties file a joint stipulation of dismissal. If the stipulation of dismissal is not filed by Friday, April 26 at 12:00 P.M., the parties may be responsible for jury fees/costs. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
73 73 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/25 10:51 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. By noon on Friday, April 25, 2024, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Notice attaching both the report and deposition transcript of Dr. Huma Haider. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
72 72 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/25 10:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court infers from the parties' joint filing at docket entry 68 that the parties agree as to a briefing schedule for late deposition designations. Therefore, in light of this agreement, Plaintiff may use the depositions of Richard Clanton, Trinity Stratemeyer, and Dr. Frederick Raffa at trial. However, given the close proximity of trial, the Court will not rule on any objected-to designations before trial. Therefore, the parties may not use video depositions at trial unless none of the testimony is subject to an objection. If any part of a video deposition is subject to an objection, the deposition must be read out loud at trial, and the Court will rule on the objections contemporaneously. See DE 15, Sections 3 and 13. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
71 71 trial Trial Brief Wed 04/24 11:50 AM
TRIAL BRIEF Joint Trial Plan by Northstar Construction Management Company, Inc., Kyle Thomas Pliler. (Kirsch, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
70 70 trial Exhibit List Tue 04/23 3:15 PM
Exhibit List Second Amended by Northstar Construction Management Company, Inc., Kyle Thomas Pliler.. (Kirsch, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
69 69 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/22 11:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the parties to submit an updated Joint Trial Plan by Wednesday, April 24th, at noon. Additionally, the Court's trial calendar has changed, and the Court now has availability during the week of April 29th. The parties shall inform the Court on April 24th, at noon, if they have availability for trial, or a part of trial (such as jury selection) that can commence during the week of April 29th. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
68 68 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 2:21 PM
Joint NOTICE of Remaining Issues that Require Adjudication by Sarah Ann Stratemeyer re67 Notice (Other) (Page, Jodi)
Related: [-]
67 67 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 11:59 AM
Defendant's NOTICE of Remaining Issues that Require Adjudication by Northstar Construction Management Company, Inc., Kyle Thomas Pliler (Kirsch, David)
Related: [-]