David Stapleton v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04681 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 26, 2023 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
David Stapleton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Stapleton WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-04681-RMG(McMurtray, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 05/03 10:33 AM
TEXT ORDER This Text Order Relates to 3029 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-01646-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-01648-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-02524-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-02528-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-03256-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-04199-RMG; (7) in case 2:22-cv-04681-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-00640-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-00667-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-01311-RMG). The motion to withdraw Emma Sikora Paulus as attorney of record for plaintiffs is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/3/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/24 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick McMurtray on behalf of James McConnaughey, Louis Sarkas, David Stapleton, Thomas Fann, Robert Sorgatz, Harris Brooks, Gus Estrada, Bobby M Kennedy, Jr, Bruce Hayes, Ronald Elder Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McMurtray, Patrick) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/21 5:59 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James McConnaughey, Louis Sarkas, David Stapleton, Thomas Fann, Robert Sorgatz, Harris Brooks, Gus Estrada, Bobby M Kennedy, Jr, Bruce Hayes, Ronald Elder. Response to Motion due by 5/5/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sikora Paulus, Emma) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/16 12:35 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to the following cases: GRANTING 2848 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-01646-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-01648-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-02524-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-02528-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-03256-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-04199-RMG; (5) in case 2:22-cv-04681-RMG) Motion of Michael Pagan to Withdraw as Attorney for James McConnaughey, Louis Sarkas, David Stapleton, Thomas Fann, Robert Sorgatz, Gus Estrada, Bobby M Kennedy, Jr. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/16/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/10 12:23 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James McConnaughey, Louis Sarkas, David Stapleton, Thomas Fann, Robert Sorgatz, Gus Estrada, Bobby M Kennedy, Jr. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pagan, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/10 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Elizabeth Sikora Paulus on behalf of James McConnaughey, Louis Sarkas, David Stapleton, Thomas Fann, Robert Sorgatz, Gus Estrada, Bobby M Kennedy, Jr Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sikora Paulus, Emma) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/28/2022), David Stapleton v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04681-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Colorado (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/27 3:01 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/27 3:02 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/28/2022), David Stapleton v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04681-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Colorado (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/27 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10866097.), filed by David Stapleton. Service due by 3/28/2023(sshe, ) |