Melvin Myers v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04685 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 26, 2023 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corp
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Myers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/22 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/28/2022), Melvin Myers v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04685-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Mexico (Las Cruces Division) (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/27 3:26 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/27 3:27 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/28/2022), Melvin Myers v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04685-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Mexico (Las Cruces Division) (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/27 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10866205.), filed by Melvin Myers. Service due by 3/28/2023(sshe, ) |