Ricks v. DMA Companies
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00773
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cr-50054 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
DMA Companies
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Diana McIver
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Roxanne Marroquin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OPC Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nichole Guptill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Stephan A. Ricks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/12/2023 3:27 AM CDT |
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
1 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Stephan A. Ricks 23-50054 (MFY) |