Levings, et al v. Dimont & Associates, et al
Original Case: 6:21-cv-00021
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-07004 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 28, 2023 2:50 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
DIMONT & ASSOCIATES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARGARET LEVINGS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES LEVINGS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2023 2:50 AM MDT |
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
[10971990] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/25/2023. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 02/08/2023 for James Levings and Margaret Levings. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 02/08/2023 for Dimont & Associates, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. 23-7004 | ||
Att: 1 25 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |