Thomas Gage v. Keith Lynch, et al
Original Case: 2:20-cv-16236
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01168 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 18, 2023 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
KEITH J. LYNCH, construction official
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BOROUGH OF NEW PROVIDENCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS I. GAGE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 17 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: JORDAN, CHUNG and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 4. |
Docket last updated: 08/18/2023 4:39 AM EDT |
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas I. Gage in District Court No. 2-20-cv-16236. (KR) | ||
Att: 1 6 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs District Court Order 011823 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |