FTC v. Elite IT Partners, et al
Original Case: 2:19-cv-00125
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-04009 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 25, 2024 1:57 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellant
ELITE IT PARTNERS, INC., a Utah corporation, DBA Elite IT Home
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JAMES MICHAEL MARTINOS, individually and as an office of Elite Partners, Inc., DBA Elite Partners, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Receiver
THOMAS R. BARTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/25/2024 1:57 AM MST |
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
[10972558] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/26/2023. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 02/09/2023 for Elite IT Partners, Inc. and James Michael Martinos. Notice of appearance due on 02/09/2023 for Federal Trade Commission. Disclosure statement due on 02/09/2023 for Elite IT Partners, Inc. 23-4009 | ||
Att: 1 43 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |