Russell v. IRS
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00026
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-usc-50062 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 01, 2023 2:54 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James E. Russell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/01/2023 2:54 AM CST |
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
1 pgs US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James E. Russell 23-50062 (CAS) |