Dyno Nobel v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Original Case: 2:22-cv-00016
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-04010 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 01, 2023 7:00 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DYNO NOBEL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 31 2023
[11040586] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after oral hearing. Written, signed, and published. Judges Holmes, McHugh (authoring judge), and Carson. Mandate to issue. [23-4010] |
Docket last updated: 11/01/2023 7:00 AM MDT |
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
[10972674] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/27/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form, disclosure statement and notice of appearance due 02/10/2023 for Dyno Nobel, Inc. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 02/10/2023 for Steadfast Insurance Company. --[Edited 01/27/2023 by MLB to edit docket text] 23-4010 | ||
Att: 1 11 pgs Preliminary Record | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |