Cecilia Luna-Diaz, et al v. Hackensack Police Department, et al
Original Case: 2:16-cv-03270
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01177 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
POLICE SERGEANT MIGUEL MOLINA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HACKENSACK POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF HACKENSACK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OFFICER ERVIN HERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
POLICE OFFICER JAMES LUTHER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
CITY OF HACKENSACK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
HACKENSACK POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
JAMES LUTHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CECILIA LUNA-DIAZ, Administratrix Ad Prosequendum of the Estate Elvin Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KELVI DIAZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JULIAN DIAZ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/20/2024 4:40 AM EDT |
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Miguel Molina in District Court No. 2-16-cv-03270. (TMM) | ||
Att: 1 4 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs DC Order 12/30/22 | ||
Att: 3 43 pgs DC Opinion | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs caption | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) Appellants seek review of the District Court order entered December 30, 2022. The order on appeal may not be final within the meaning of 28 U.S..C. Section 1291 or otherwise appealable at this time. Compare Mitchell v. Forsyth, 472 U.S. 511, 530 (1985), with Johnson v. Jones, 515 U.S. 304, 319-20 (1995). All parties must file written responses addressing this this issue within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. 23-1177 23-1178 SEND TO MERITS PANEL.--[Edited 05/24/2023 by TMM] (TMM) | ||
2 pgs CLERK ORDER The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, the plaintiffs'/appellees' brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). The parties are hereby directed to electronically file documents on the Court's docket as follows: Appellants: All case-opening forms, motions, and briefs must be filed only in the appeal number assigned to the filer's notice of appeal. If a document is being filed jointly by multiple appellants, the document must be filed only in the appeal numbers assigned to the filing appellants. Appellees: All case-opening forms must be filed in all appeals in which the appellees intend to participate. All motions should be filed only in those cases for which the relief is being requested. The plaintiffs' consolidated brief must be filed in all appeals to which they are responding. The consolidated joint appendix must be filed in all appeal numbers. The parties are advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. 23-1177 23-1178 (TMM) |