Mason et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00396 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 6:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Connie James Fowler, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Daniel Cernie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Keith Chipp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geoffrey Miles Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Anthony Clinton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Joseph Cliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Ray Coe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Howard Colbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl David Collier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Collins, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Eugene Conley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence William Connelly, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Russell Conrad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Allen Copeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Leon Cotton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Aaron Coultas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert James Courtois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ethan Douglas Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NIcholas Ray Crober
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy James Crum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Austin Cutler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Keith Cypert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Allen Daly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lenny Damcott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl John Dappen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell J David
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelaine Faithe Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Eric Deboard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Melvin Decker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Deguzman, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murphy Paul Delhomme
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael L Devor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Frederick Diffell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Dwayne Dill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Patrick Dowling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Lee Duggan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Esteban
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lowell Lee Ester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Lee Faison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Farris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Sean Fawcett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Daniel Figueroa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelley Alonzo Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Dean Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Gregory Fisk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Edwin Fosberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim William Franken
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CArlos Alberto Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Michael Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Dane Garner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Shawn Garretson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Bennett Gee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirby John Giampa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Norris Goering, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Adan Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Goodchild
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Martin Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Weldon Gotcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sanuel Steven Gould, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Carter Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Emanuel Grimes, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Von Lee Gruber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Frank Hamann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Guillory Hampton, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy W Hankinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Masaaki Hara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Carleton Harman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edgar Harton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Michael Haskamp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lawrence Hayles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley John Hering
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Thomas Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Justin Herndon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clair Dee Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul William Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Darren Hirons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Clifford Hogan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Dean Hummel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myron Eugene Ingram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Arthur Irwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Lee Iverson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Frederick Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Wayne Jessee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Earl Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Wayne Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick Joseph Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Lee Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Vernon Jones, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Arnold Jones, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Saul Jonke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Elmer Keip
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie King, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Casimer Kozlowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Rudolph Kunick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Walter Kurowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Lamanna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Frederick Lansing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Farrell Lapine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Lee Larson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerod Elton Leach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl James Leblanc, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Todd Lemaster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David G Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Meryl Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott James Liske
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Anthony Lombardi, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Francis Lorow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Lowe, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney William Luck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Bruce Lundgren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M Luther
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Patrick Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Alan Mabe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Al Salvatore Macri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Arlington Maddox, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Charles Madigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stuart Mahaffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Alan Mann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Peter Mariani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl Gray Markhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Bruce Mason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Dirk Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Thomas Greenback
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camille Couch Schultz
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Richard Allen Macmurdo
Terminated: 06/08/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Allan Banks, DONN JOHNSON, BILLY LIPPSE, GREGORY LOGAN, JOHN MANNING, DENNIS MCENTYRE, LOUIS MCLELLAN, SR, MICHAEL MENGEL, AUSTIN MILLER, Doug Morgan, Ronald Lee Bogo, George Michael Brooks, Brian Burks, Jose Castro, Maynard Coleman, James Cutino, Michael P Sprinkle, William St. Claire, Sr, Albert A Stone, Brian P Szwec, Donald Vessey, Lee Vetsch, Archie Walker, Collie Washington, Ronald Williams, Rex Alan Wilson, James Wunderlich, Kimberly Wyttenberg, David Lee Lineberger, Edward Earl Johnson, Stuart Mahaffey, David Wayne Muckerheide, Kingsley Washington Nelson, James O'Brien, Victor Orvis, William Partain, Richard J Peck, Terry Peters, Octavio Plascencia, GORDON SCOTT ELLIS, SR, CHARLES ESPY, ANDY GRANDERSON, GLENN G GRAVES, DAVID GUTIERREZ, KIRK HEYEN, JOHN HOCHMUTH, LLOYD HOFFMAN; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 07/10 2:01 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Mason et al. v. 3M Co. et al., Case No. 2:23-cv-396-RMG. The unopposed motion to substitute Camille Schultz for Kenneth Couch Dkt. No. 3347 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (15) in case 2:23-cv-00396-RMG) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/10/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00396-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 06/27 12:15 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by Kenneth Lee Couch. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00396-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Death Certificate | ||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 06/26 1:57 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Mason et al. v. 3M Co. et al. Case No. 2:23-cv-00396-RMG. Plaintiff moves to substitute John Thomas Greenback, as Executor of Robin's estate, for Robin Herbert Greenback as a party to this action. The unopposed motion to substitute (Dkt. No. 3266 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (9) in case 2:23-cv-00396-RMG) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/26/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00396-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/08 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Allen Macmurdo Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00396-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 06/06 12:48 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by Richard Allen Macmurdo. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00396-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
9 | 9
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 06/06 12:46 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by Robin Herbert Greenbank. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00396-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00024, Mason et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00396-RMG (sshe, ) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/31 10:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00024. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 01/31 10:46 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00024, Mason et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00396-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS3 . Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 1/11/2023. (FNC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
3 | 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County,AL on 12/8/2022. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | ||
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2022-903689.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4244521 (ALND receipt# B-3130). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2022-903689.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 1/10/2023 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] |