Nylander et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00039 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
John Merrill Adams, JR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Eugene Ahlberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Theodore Allen, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irvin Fernando Amya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Edward Angell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy John Batayias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan James Beck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hanns Christopher Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jared David Bills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramon Roddy Bione
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Frank Blauvelt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sanfred Blodgett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher James Booker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Dale Boswell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Bowles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Eldon Bray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Arthur Bristow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Andre Brittell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew David Buchli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derard Joe Buckner, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dane Patrick Bulmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reggie Dean Cashmere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivo Garcia Ceciliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Thomas Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Matthew Clement
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Allen Cloud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Charles Cole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pierre A Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlisle Clinton Conolley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Lee Cotton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Dean Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert R Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Lee Currier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Edward Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Travis Dedear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rand L Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Philip Ebel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric James Eisele
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walton Elton Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John William Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth William Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael T Frizzell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Harold Godlove
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Lane Golightly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Ray Gooch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Wayne Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dewey Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Gerard Greenwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Allen Gregson, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kenneth Haley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Stephen Hance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Brice Hartzog
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Michael Haymaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas B. Helton, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter James Hessings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Huber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Thomas Huford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Shane Huggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lee Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Glenn Ingram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lonnie Lee Irvin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edward Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Henry Johnson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Allen Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Steven Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Thomas Jorgensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harvey Frederick Judd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Michael Keay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dale Kelso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lee Kirkland, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Leroy Kugelman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Edward Ladmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Joe Lambert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sherman Lawyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bucky Joe Lipsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benito Anthony Luciani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Shawn Malley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Jack McCook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Scott McDanal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Dale McGaha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Leslie Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brett Lebaron Minor, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Charles Moffett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Hart Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Tyler Moren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Robert Nodonly, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Bruce Nylander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Wayne Pernell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gery Lee Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Edward Pinkey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Ronald Pombrio, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Pruitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stormie Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Roger Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Rodriguez, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Pittsburgh Roe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Wallace Ruebush
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Fernando Saenz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Harris Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Robert Signaigo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Singleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Jon Sneddon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Curtis St. Dennis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Lee Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D. Tavis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Scott Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel C. Theis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Lee Toftee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Hinano Tsuchiya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Bruce Usher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sergio Valdez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Scott Varner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Mark Vesely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Guy Walcott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian Cleveland Walker, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Richard Wash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Whitten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carey Andrew Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Thomas Yanes
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
David Michael Fontana
Terminated: 04/28/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Timothy Higgins
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Judson, Jr.
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Whitaker
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/28 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Michael Fontana Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00397-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 2:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Allen Judson, Jr. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00397-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 2:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Robin Whitaker. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00397-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 2:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Curtis Timothy Higgins. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00397-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00039, Nylander et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00397-RMG (sshe, ) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/31 10:49 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00039. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 01/31 10:52 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00039, Nylander et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00397-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
5 | 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND - ITS IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the parties hereto and their undersigned counsel that if this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability multi-district litigation ("AFFF MDL"), then the deadline for all Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Should the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, all Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 1/12/2023. (MEB2) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4246789 (B3177). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22-903745., filed by 3M Company. (KAM). (Radney, W) Modified on 1/12/2023 (MEB2). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE by 3M Company (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22-903745., filed by 3M Company.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-5 |