Shell et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00400 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00040 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 6:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Barry Kenneth Abrams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Absher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Douglas Adair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles David Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Aguilar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd F. Aicher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Winfield Aldrich, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Edward Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Athay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Thomas Atwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Wayne Baggett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Loyd Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Michael Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Steven Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Allan Banks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Lynn Bartholomew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen R. Batson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huey Pearce Battiste
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Ten Bear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Louie Beckham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Lewis Beeson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Edward Benson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Charles Bergeron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eldon Glenn Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley David Beyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick Francis Bisson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kerry Bludnick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvatore Bologna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Anthony Bomar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Boren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Leon Breuklander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Reginald Broome
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert Brown, .
#81899-004 Edgefield FCI PO Box 725
Edgefield, SC 29824 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dee Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Allen Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Marcus Buck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Thomas Bulger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael David Burley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Franklin Caldwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John McClain Campbell, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Maryland Carleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Edward Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Shane Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Lee Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lee Cash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Dean Cheek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Burl Chennault, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Christopher Christiani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddy Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Patrick Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Eugene Cole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Lee Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Jude Cormier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Delphi Cortright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Robin Cowart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas John Cramer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Robert Cranford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morgan Owen Cronk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Crowley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Daigneault
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Council Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Bert Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charin Hudson Davenport
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Vanghn Davidson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freedrick Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Joe Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald L. Dayton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Dewey Delahoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Martin Dimaggio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George William Dodd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Robert Dottery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Charles Doxsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Jeffrey Dubois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Wayne Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendell Keith Duplechaine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew John Dyke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cederic Mishawn Ealy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Joseph Easterling, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Loren Ebke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Wesley Ellis, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe E. Elsea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael W. Elzy, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome E. Engle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Randall Erb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Joseph Espinosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Thomas Feeley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Arnold Felton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Fields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Ford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fordham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamal Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Alexander Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John A Frye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Ken Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Douglas Gallagher-Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Granville Gant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlton T. Garnica
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Garibay Garnica
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geoffrey Fredrick Garrod
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Allen Gibbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald J. Gillies
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Arthur Gladd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Alex Goin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Martin Goldberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Humberto Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Earl Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Grolich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Eugene Guard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Earl Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Allen Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason McKinley Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Clayton Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Thomas Judd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert De La Rosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Clarence Shell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacie Schmahl
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Jimmie Wayne Boyd
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward James Carrow
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Earl Foster
Terminated: 05/03/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orlando Fulton
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Allan Banks, DONN JOHNSON, BILLY LIPPSE, GREGORY LOGAN, JOHN MANNING, DENNIS MCENTYRE, LOUIS MCLELLAN, SR, MICHAEL MENGEL, AUSTIN MILLER, Doug Morgan, Ronald Lee Bogo, George Michael Brooks, Brian Burks, Jose Castro, Maynard Coleman, James Cutino, Michael P Sprinkle, William St. Claire, Sr, Albert A Stone, Brian P Szwec, Donald Vessey, Lee Vetsch, Archie Walker, Collie Washington, Ronald Williams, Rex Alan Wilson, James Wunderlich, Kimberly Wyttenberg, David Lee Lineberger, Edward Earl Johnson, Stuart Mahaffey, David Wayne Muckerheide, Kingsley Washington Nelson, James O'Brien, Victor Orvis, William Partain, Richard J Peck, Terry Peters, Octavio Plascencia, GORDON SCOTT ELLIS, SR, CHARLES ESPY, ANDY GRANDERSON, GLENN G GRAVES, DAVID GUTIERREZ, KIRK HEYEN, JOHN HOCHMUTH, LLOYD HOFFMAN; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Thu 06/01 9:53 AM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Shell et al. v. 3M Co. et al. Case No. 2:23-cv-00400-RMG. The unopposed motion to substitute (Dkt. No. 3162 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (16) in case 2:23-cv-00400-RMG) is granted. Stacie Schmahl is substituted for Roger Randolph Askin Jr. as a party to this action. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/31/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00400-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Substitute Party
Wed 05/24 3:19 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by Roger Randolph Askin, Jr. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00400-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Death Certificate | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/03 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clayton Earl Foster Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00400-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 3:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Orlando Fulton. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00400-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Edward James Carrow. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00400-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 3:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jimmie Wayne Boyd. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00400-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00040, Shell et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00400-RMG (sshe, ) | |
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/31 3:50 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER re2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by 3M Company. STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 1/13/2023. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2022-903756.00., filed by 3M Company.(JLC) (JLC, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4 | ||
Att: 5 (1/12/2023) State Notice | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4247423. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2022-903756.00., filed by 3M Company.(JLC). (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/31/2023.] |