Haynes v. State of Texas
Original Case: 6:20-cv-00192
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-pcf-40063 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2023 3:36 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
County of Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of Tyler, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Cathy Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2023 3:36 AM CDT |
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
6 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Cathy Haynes. 23-40063 (RLL) |