KPH Healthcare Services, et al v. Mylan, N.V., et al
Original Case: 2:20-cv-02065
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-03014 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 1:22 AM MST |
Defendant
MYLAN ENTITIES
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
PFIZER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MERIDIAN MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MYLAN N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, AKA Kinney Drugs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
FWK HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CESAR CASTILLO, LLC, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/01/2023 1:22 AM MST |
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
[10973189] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/30/2023. Docketing statement due 02/13/2023 for Cesar Castillo, LLC, FWK Holdings, LLC and KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Transcript order form due 02/13/2023 for Cesar Castillo, LLC, FWK Holdings, LLC and KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Notice of appearance due on 02/13/2023 for Cesar Castillo, LLC, FWK Holdings, LLC, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., King Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. and Pfizer, Inc.. Disclosure statement due on 02/13/2023 for Cesar Castillo, LLC, FWK Holdings, LLC, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., King Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., and Pfizer, Inc. 23-3014 | ||
Att: 1 153 pgs Prelim ROA | ||
Att: 2 206 pgs Prelim ROA II | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |