Monk et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00401 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00043 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 5:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Lee Grubb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Keith Gunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Francis Hahn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Hako
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Trent Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly K Ham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerame Allen Hamrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Thomas Harris, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven James Hartmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Patrick Haverty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Len Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Neal Helderman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Joe Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin J Heslep
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Michael Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Frances Hogan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lonnie J Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Kermit Hottenstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Dane Human
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Charles Hunsaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Hutchison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malcolm Wayne Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Read Jaffrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Janulis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deana Lynn Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Robert Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Andrew Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaleel Jibreel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christen Matthew Johnsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Arling Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Randolph Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Todd Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward James Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Kyle Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tobias J Kerby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Ray Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randal Kobyluk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug W Kooiman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Michael Kopp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Krantz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L Kreafle, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Edward Kroll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Nelson Krom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen T Kruszalnicki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Lynn Lacomb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Land
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael John Landen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Thomas Larkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Latham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Harlen Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edgar Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Linares
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Lindahl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lee Lineberger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Edward Lipford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Thomas Locascio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Lockhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lon Cameron Lockwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Curtis Longacre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Lott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick William Lowery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Lionel Luckett, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Dean Lynn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Charles Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George B Madison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edwin Maile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Joseph Mann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angelo A Marchese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian James Markewinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lane A Marsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Layman Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Manuel Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Walter Masirovits
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rex Allen Mathre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephan James Matney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Thomas Mattson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John L Mauldin, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald William Maury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Michael Mazza, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie H McCue, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byron Patterson McDaniel, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Michael McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas George McKelvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Michael McKenna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Phillip McKinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert James George McKnight, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Parke McLean, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew B Meach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Charley Meddings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Earl Meese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Patrick Melican, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guinavere Meneely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montressor Cortez Merrill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Jon Merz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kenneth Meyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Laroy Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Mohler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Dean Monk, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Morgenthal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Allan Morin, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Vincent Morris, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rashid Muhammad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gearl Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Frank Munsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle David Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Nass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Niemann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathon Radcliff Nimmo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Jay Norton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Wayne O'Dell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Burnice Lee Willie O'Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Michael Olah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilfred Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Lynn Otto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Morris Ozment
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric James Palfrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Wayne Routier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Dale Toft
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Clifford Huebner
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter James LeCompte
Terminated: 05/10/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard McCormack
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel John McKay
Terminated: 04/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas E Miller
Terminated: 04/17/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Allan Banks, DONN JOHNSON, BILLY LIPPSE, GREGORY LOGAN, JOHN MANNING, DENNIS MCENTYRE, LOUIS MCLELLAN, SR, MICHAEL MENGEL, AUSTIN MILLER, Doug Morgan, Ronald Lee Bogo, George Michael Brooks, Brian Burks, Jose Castro, Maynard Coleman, James Cutino, Michael P Sprinkle, William St. Claire, Sr, Albert A Stone, Brian P Szwec, Donald Vessey, Lee Vetsch, Archie Walker, Collie Washington, Ronald Williams, Rex Alan Wilson, James Wunderlich, Kimberly Wyttenberg, David Lee Lineberger, Edward Earl Johnson, Stuart Mahaffey, David Wayne Muckerheide, Kingsley Washington Nelson, James O'Brien, Victor Orvis, William Partain, Richard J Peck, Terry Peters, Octavio Plascencia, GORDON SCOTT ELLIS, SR, CHARLES ESPY, ANDY GRANDERSON, GLENN G GRAVES, DAVID GUTIERREZ, KIRK HEYEN, JOHN HOCHMUTH, LLOYD HOFFMAN; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/01 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rex Allen Mathre, William Cecil Blair, Lawrence Kevin Blieka, Terrence L Bloome, Philip Herbert Boruszewski, Marvell Tyrone Bowman, Weldon Fairchild Bowman, III, Steve Broussard, Averell Stephen Brown, Todd Matthew Brown, Senator Madison Brunson, Larry P Buckley, James Richard Burg, Michael Joseph Burke, Thomas J Burns, Sr, James Edward Carroll, Jr, Rodney Tatem Cason, Sr, John Dennis Catrombon, Jr, William George Cattorini, Emmett Dudley Cole, Jr, Henry Lester Cole, Donald Ray Coleman, Gregory Eugene Coleman, Greg Steven Collins, Kurt L. Collins, John Lloyd Conn, Thomas Patrick Convery, Michael Glenn Corson, Claude E. Corthran, Robert Joseph Costa, Thomas Peter Costanzo, Douglas Lowell Cox, Howard Walter Cox, II, Charles Cody Cull, Gary Thomas Cummings, Frank T Abel, John Edward Aiple, Franklin James Alexander, Danny Norman Alford, Gary Wayne Allen, Paul Anthony Anderson, David Appelblatt, Robert Raymond Autilio, David Clark Bailey, Jr, David B Bannister, James Henry Barry, Charles John Battiste, Derrick Montiz Beckom, Sr, John Daniel Berg, Norris James Bethancourt WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG, 2:23-cv-01238-RMG, 2:23-cv-01239-RMG, 2:23-cv-01240-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/19 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Thomas Mattson WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/10 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peter James LeCompte Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/17 3:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Douglas E Miller. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 2:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Clifford Huebner. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 2:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Richard McCormack. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/11 9:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Daniel John McKay. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00043, Monk et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00401-RMG (sshe, ) | |
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 02/01 4:01 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendant 3M Company has filed a motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc.3 ). 3M requests that to the extent this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability multi-district litigation (the "AFFF MDL") its deadline to respond to the complaint be in accordance with the AFFF MDL rules, and that to the extent the action is not transferred to the AFFF MDL it be afforded 28 days after the AFFF MDL court's decision denying a request to transfer within which to file a responsive pleading in this action. The motion is GRANTED to the extent the court stays the deadline for the defendants to respond to the complaint pending a decision by the AFFF MDL court whether to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL. 3M SHALL notify this court promptly if the AFFF MDL court denies its request to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL, at which time this court will set a new deadline for responsive pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 01/19/2023. (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of case to a U. S. magistrate judge for trial this 13th day of January, 2023. (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion is RIPE 1/12/2023 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22-903766., filed by 3M Company.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4247616. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22-903766., filed by 3M Company.(KAM). (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] |