Ray et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00402 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00044 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Timothy William Palivoda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Michael Patricks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Payrot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Pearce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Pease
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Thomas Pender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Robert Pennington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Dean Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Robert Phinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Winslow Phinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Shane Pike
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Charles Popovich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Erich Poppe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey W Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Anthony Principato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Patrick Rafferty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie George Randall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Dean Rawlinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edward Ray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Floyd Raybon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael George Reilly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott David Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Vincent Ridenour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rance R Rivers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert R Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Rohman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rolan Cesar Romero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Francis Rooney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Roth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Allen Rouse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Joseph Ruffle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott E Rybar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Rychel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard L Sample
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Lee Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Alan Sankster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell Ray Schapker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Paul Schiska
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fondi Scholl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Dewayne Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Alan Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Shadwick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Ronnie Shagun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Michael Shotwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tal D Siglar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard John Simicich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Douglas Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurence David Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Randall Sims
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Robert Skipper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph S Smario, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Henry Smart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrin Smith
Y309505 Turbeville Correctional Institution PO Box 252
Turbeville, SC 29162 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Leroy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Alan Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Bernard Snell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Soto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Scott Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Lee Sprowls, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Lee Staton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert William Stedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Anthony Stephenson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darryl Edward Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Wayne Stoneking
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wallace Sweeney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lee Switzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Richard Szymanski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Earl Taylor, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John E Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Lyman Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Tejeda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Edward Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dickie Thompson, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark S Torbett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Tully
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Allen Tumelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean A Valdez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Burton Stewart Van Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Vega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J Verrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth L Verruso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Cesar Villa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eldon Burlon Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Michael Walsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cliff Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Edward Weaver, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Macarthur Webster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Huel West
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Paul Whannell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Allen Widdis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Warren Wiggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Drew Wilborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Todd Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Jay Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Walter Wiseman, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Joseph Wolf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Welch Oliver Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cedric D Word
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Joseph York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew F Zangle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Richard Zilka
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Jack Ray Puz
Terminated: 06/23/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David M Smith
Terminated: 04/12/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/28 8:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Laurence David Simmons, David Randall Sims, Delbert Eugene Powell, Roderick Charles Prast, James Terrace Queen, Donald Scott Reeves, Bill Rensko, Ronald John Reynolds, Anthony Edward Rich, Daniel Joseph Richards, David Edward Riley, Antonio Ricardo Rivera, Chris Alan Rodrigue, Nicholas Richard Rodriguez, Herslyn Antonio Romero, Steven Charles Ronick, Terry Keith Rousey, Stanley Anthony Rupenski, Jr, Alfonso Richter Salazar, John Roger Sands, James Francis Savarese, William Radius Schaaf, Thomas John Scholz, Michael Wayne Scott, Hubert Junior Smith, Kenneth Edward Smith, William Jason Smith, James Thomas Snyder, Jr, Myron Leroy Snyder, Arthur Jerrold Sobota, Patricia Sokolowski, Scott Michael Somers, David John Southard, Daniel Clark White, Kevin Eugene White, Michael Joseph White, Robert Edward White, Garnell Wilborn Whitfield, Jr, Karl Allen Whitt, Steven Douglas Wilcox, Maxie Douglas Wilkinson, Arthur Williams, Gerald Edward Williams, Jeffrey Scott Young, George Yuhas, Wayne Richard Zamagne, James Wilford Zeirke, David Allen Zietlow, Michael Ray Zimmerman, Thomas John Zurawski WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00402-RMG, 2:23-cv-02841-RMG, 2:23-cv-03303-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 10/19 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Lee Switzer WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00402-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/23 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Ray Puz WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00402-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/12 3:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by David M Smith. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-00402-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/30/2023), 2:23-cv-00044, Ray et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00402-RMG (sshe, ) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 02/01 4:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00044. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER-Plaintiffs and Defendant 3M Company have filed a stipulation extending time to respond to the Summons and Complaint.4 . If the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, all Defendants will have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERM document 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/18/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion is RIPE 1/13/2023 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W) Modified on 1/18/2023-terminated motion See doc.6 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4247849 (ALND receipt# B-3198). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County AL, case number 01-CV-2022-903778.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 1/13/2023 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | ||
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County AL, case number 01-CV-2022-903778.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4 |