Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colin Stirling Bruce
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 2:23-cv-02029
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2023 6:01 AM CDT
Defendant
STARC Solutions LLC
Plaintiff
NAD Bol II LLC
Represented By
Michael Thomas Franz
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
8 8 misc Judgment Tue 06/27 3:25 PM
JUDGMENT entered (SKR)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/27 3:03 PM
ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/27/23. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment6 is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. This case is terminated. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
misc Remark Thu 05/04 9:51 AM
Remark: On 4/28/2023, Plaintiff filed an Application for Refund of Electronic Filing Fee, Receipt #AILCDC-4136812, due to a duplicative payment. The Application was granted and a refund of $402 was processed to the credit card used for the original transaction. (TK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
6 6 motion Default Judgment Fri 04/14 8:51 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff NAD Bol II LLC. Responses due by 4/28/2023 (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/13 10:00 AM
TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/13/23. The Court construes Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment as a Motion for Entry of Default. The Motion5 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to make an entry of default against Defendant. Plaintiff's deadline to file a Motion for Default Judgment is 21 days. (SKR)
Related: [-]
order Entry of Default Thu 04/13 10:03 AM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to STARC Solutions LLC Entered by the clerk on 4/13/23. (SKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
5 5 motion Default Judgment Wed 03/29 1:26 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff NAD Bol II LLC. Responses due by 4/12/2023 (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 9:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on STARC Solutions LLC on 3/2/23, filed by NAD Bol II LLC. (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/22 11:53 AM
Summons Issued as to STARC Solutions LLC. Copies returned to plaintiff for service. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
2 2 misc Exhibit Thu 02/16 3:38 PM
Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet by NAD Bol II, LLC. (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Attorney Complaint Thu 02/16 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against STARC Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4136928.), filed by NAD Bol II, LLC.(Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]