Keister v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glen H Davidson |
Referred: | David A Sanders |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00027 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Choctaw County Circuit Court, 22-00036-CV-R |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 12:53 PM CDT |
Defendant
Dolgencorp, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Sandie Keister
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
74 | 74
appeal
Appeal Transcript Request
Thu 07/18 2:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Darryl Moses Gibbs on behalf of Sandie Keister for proceedings held on 8/8/2023 before Judge David A. Sanders, re USCA Case Number,73 Notice of Appeal,, Transcript due by 8/16/2024. (Gibbs, Darryl) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/16 3:07 PM
USCA Case Number 24-60356 for73 Notice of Appeal. (lgm) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/11 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to70 Memorandum Opinion,71 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Darryl Moses Gibbs on behalf of Sandie Keister. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AMSNDC-2411741. Transcript Order Form to appellant available electronically ([LINK:Transcript Order Form] ) or by U.S. Mail as appropriate. (Gibbs, Darryl) |
|
72 | 72
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/11 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raynetra L. Gustavis on behalf of Sandie Keister (Gustavis, Raynetra) |