MOHR v. THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Chad F Kenney |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00731 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Court of Common Pleas of Phila., No. 230102149, No. 230102149 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 10:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHNATHON MOHR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 03/15 7:27 AM
ORDER THAT CASE BE REMOVED FROM STAY. CASE SHALL BE REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FOR PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, CONSISTENT WITH THE COURTS MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (DOCS. 16 & 17). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/14/24. 3/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. *CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY*(rf, ) |
|
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 03/14 10:20 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to25 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA(rf, ) |
|
Att: 1 USCA OPINION | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Wed 05/24 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re25 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. USCA Case Number 23-1924 (rf, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/19 12:38 PM
ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SOPHIE L. KLETZEIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/19/23. 5/19/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
Fri 05/19 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Memorandum and/or Opinion,17 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number APAEDC-16701459. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 05/18 6:20 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sophie L. Kletzien ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16700529.) filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA..(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 05/18 2:49 PM
ORDER granting20 MOTION TO STAY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/18/23.5/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/18 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by HYUN YOON on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(YOON, HYUN) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/17 5:33 PM
NOTICE by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA re20 MOTION to Stay re19 Order on Motion to Stay,17 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), until the Third Circuit decides the coming appeal, (Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion for Stay of Remand Order Until the Third Circuit Rules on the Pending Appeal)(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Emergency Motion to Adjourn The Case Management Conference filed with the Court of Common Pleas for Philadelphia County on May 17, 2023 | ||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Fri 04/28 10:39 AM
MOTION to Stay re19 Order on Motion to Stay,17 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), until the Third Circuit decides the coming appeal, filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in support of motion, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 04/24 11:56 AM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF REMAND ORDER (ECF NO.18 ) THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE OF REMAND (ECF NO. 17), WHICH IS APPEALABLE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1447(D), IS STAYED FOR 30 DAYS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/24/23.4/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stay
Fri 04/21 1:09 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay re17 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA..(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Fri 04/21 8:56 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NO. 13) AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE (ECF NO. 15), AND FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, THIS CASE SHALL BE REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FOR PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/20/23. 4/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND CCP PHILADELPHIA COUNTY.(jaa, ) |
|
16 | 16
10
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Fri 04/21 8:51 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/20/23. 4/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/10 4:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Remand (Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff Johnathon Mohr's Motion to Remand) filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/06 10:31 AM
ORDER dismissing10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/6/23.4/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Remand
Mon 03/27 4:34 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by JOHNATHON MOHR.Brief, Certificate of Service.(SCHWARTZ, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Brief | ||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/24 11:02 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF NEED NOT FILE A RESPONSE TO THIS MOTION UNTIL AFTER THE COURT MAKES A DETERMINATION ON A FORTHCOMING MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/24/23. 3/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 03/24 7:29 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part9 MOTION TO STAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/23/23.3/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 03/23 7:33 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Defendant Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action.(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Paul Bond, Esq, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stay
Thu 03/23 12:37 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Forthcoming Motion to Remand filed by JOHNATHON MOHR.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(SCHWARTZ, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/01 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL BOND on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (BOND, PAUL) |
|
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record
Wed 03/01 1:37 PM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 02/28 9:19 AM
ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PAUL BOND IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/28/23. 2/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Mon 02/27 3:18 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul Bond by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16526066.). (BOND, PAUL) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 02/27 11:44 AM
ORDER THAT THE REMOVING DEFENDANTS SHALL ON ECF ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 3/27/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/27/23. 2/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 02/27 11:42 AM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), (e) or (f) SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/27/23. 2/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/27 11:13 AM
NOTICE by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Revised Designation Form (per request from the Court) (MELODIA, MARK) |
|
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Mon 02/27 10:48 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Civil Box was not checked off. (sbt) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Fri 02/24 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16523100), filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 99 pgs Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 6 to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, | ||
Att: 4 Designation Form Designation Form |